Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Monsarrat, Mark P., Redwood Shores Real Estate, Inc., Reynolds, Rob, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Warhurst, William R., against Bogart, Scott, Does 12 To 50, Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Flor, Marvin, Redwood Shores Real Estate, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Levy, David M., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Ernst A. Halperin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management308 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2017 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial1049 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 09, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: November 12, 2020Notice
Date: November 12, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: November 06, 2020Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: November 12, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2018Complaint
Date: July 12, 2017First Amended Complaint
Date: August 21, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: April 03, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: November 08, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: November 01, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: July 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 10, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: November 08, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 08, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 10, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: August 21, 2018Order
Date: August 21, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: August 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 04, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice NOTICE OF LODGING ORIGINAL CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPTS RE: REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC . DB NOTICE OF LODGING ORIGINAL CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPTS RE: REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC . DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PRO Proposed Order Received (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATON FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP SECTION 877.6(a)(2) FWD: TO DEPT. 4 |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF YVONNE V. JORGNESEN OF REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC. DBA REMAX STAR PRO Declaration in Support OF YVONNE V. JORGNESEN OF REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT Notice OF SETTLEMENT |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC O Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC ON 11/08/18 |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO R Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES (AKA DOE 10) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.