Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Miranda, Salvador, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lundberg, Jason, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Does 1 To 9, Santos, Alvardo Dos, Santos, Ana Lamperti, Santos, Virginia Dos, (total of 6) See All represented by Frangos, James D., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2017 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial622 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time253 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Salvador Miranda against Francisco Suarez, Virginia Dos Santos, Alvaro Dos Santos, and Ana Lamperti Santos. The complaint alleges employer negligence and general negligence. Salvador Miranda, the plaintiff,...
Motion to Deem Facts as Admitted
Date: April 25, 2018Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 09, 2017Notice of Court Hearing
Date: September 06, 2017Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: June 01, 2017Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: March 23, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions
Date: November 07, 2017Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: June 05, 2017Summons Issued / Filed
Date: May 02, 2017Motion
Date: March 23, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 25, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 02, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 02, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: May 16, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 17, 2018Motion
Date: May 17, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2018Default Prove-Up Hearing
Date: January 02, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration
Date: March 23, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 28, 2017Motion to Deem Facts as Admitted
Date: June 18, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: February 26, 2019Declaration
Date: May 17, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: March 23, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 30, 2018Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: December 11, 2018Motion
Date: September 17, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 06, 2017Proposed Order Received
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration
Date: March 23, 2018Complaint
Date: May 02, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 25, 2017Court Trial
Date: January 14, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 26, 2018Declaration
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 23, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 23, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 17, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 23, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 01, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 17, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: March 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2017Motion to Terminate Sanctions
Date: October 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 02/26/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Court Trial 01/14/2019 COURT TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 2 DAYS Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Default Prove-Up Hearing 01/02/2019 Default Prove-Up Hearing Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Case ordered off calendar | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request ON UNCONSTESTED CALENDAR Request ON UNCONSTESTED CALENDAR |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED ON 12/17/2018 Request to Enter Default PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED ON 12/17/2018 |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to Defendants ALVARO DOS SANT Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice as to Defendants ALVARO DOS SANTOS and VIRGINIA DOS SANTOS only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.