Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pabalate, Amelia A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Ensafi, Laleh, against Does 1 To 25, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, U.S. Bank National Association, represented by Balser, Justin D., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time31 days |
Complaint
Date: February 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of SERVED TO ADDRESS OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of SERVED TO ADDRESS OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT Notice OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | First Paper Fee Paid (Unlimited) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JUSTIN D. BALSER Notice OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JUSTIN D. BALSER |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.