Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lee, Chun Ho, Lee, Lili, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Burneikis, Monica, against Does 1 To 25, Mullins, Patrick Fortunate, represented by Pinelli, Anthony F, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Nancy L. Fineman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Fineman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial521 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time285 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The plaintiffs are Chun Ho Lee and Lili Lee, and the defendant is Patrick Fortunate Mullins. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, an...
Complaint
Date: December 29, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: February 08, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 08, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 04, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: December 19, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: October 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 16, 2019Separate Statement
Date: January 16, 2019Ex Parte Declaration
Date: February 15, 2019Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 04, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: August 02, 2019Amended Notice Of
Date: January 16, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: February 19, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: February 08, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 16, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 16, 2019Order
Date: March 15, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: February 28, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: January 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Parties notified via email Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 10 DAYS
Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 05/20/2019 Mandatory Settlement Conference Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Type: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL NEUROLOGICAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFFSigned by: JUDGE DAVISDa Order Type: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL NEUROLOGICAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 3/14/19 |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer #1 ORDER FOR MOTION TO COMPEL Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer #1 ORDER FOR MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order DUPLICATE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL ( PARTY RECEIVED COPY OF STIP AND ORDER FILE Order DUPLICATE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL ( PARTY RECEIVED COPY OF STIP AND ORDER FILED ON 02/15/19 TRIAL DATE SET FROM THE 02/15/19 ORDER) |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 02/19/2019 Motion to Compel Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.