Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liu Nathan, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Quarles Ellario Larry, Quarles Jacob, Quarles Joshua, Quarles Julie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with S. Paul Bruguera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeS. Paul Bruguera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ELLARIO QUARLES .
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JULIE QUARLES .
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Other - STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: ELLARIO LARRY QUARLES (Defendant)
Date: December 27, 2021Notice CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE; Filed by:
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 27, 2022Affidavit of Identity and Order; Filed by: NATHAN LIU (Plaintiff); As to: JULIE QUARLES (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Other - STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 17, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service - Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service
Date: November 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ELLARIO QUARLES .
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JULIE QUARLES .
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Notice CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE; Filed by:
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Affidavit of Identity and Order; Filed by: NATHAN LIU (Plaintiff); As to: JULIE QUARLES (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: ELLARIO LARRY QUARLES (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.