Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oyama Noriko, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Haskard Kathleen A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Kenji Machida presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
E-Filing Request for Certified Mail; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/27/2016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 27, 2016Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/15/2016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Kathleen A Haskard (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Noriko Oyama (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 11, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.