Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linda Zizmor, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order |
|
March 01, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for distribution of trust funds, and to modify trust due to changed circumstanes |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Status Report |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.