Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anna Mirabel, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person Only |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Guardian Person | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Letters: Guardianship | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order: Appoint Guardian | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request to dispense with notice |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Child Custody Proceedings for Indian Child |
|
February 14, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Guardian Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.