Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sherry Luo, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2016 |
CategoryConservatorship: Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Letters: Conservatorship Limited | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Determination: Appropriate Level of Care for Conservatee Determination of Conservatee???s Appropriate Level of Care |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of: Conservatee's Rights Notice of Conservatee's Rights |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Order: Compliance | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Conservator Person Limited |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assessment: Regional Center Ltd conservatorship:Regional Center assessement |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
CI Assessment Invoice: Court Investigator $900 ci fee waived for cir dated 1/12/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.