Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
13333 Fenton Avenue Llc Dba Mountain View Convalescent Hospital, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Apc Thomas A Collins, against California Dept Of Public Health, State Of California Health And, represented by Wang Kenneth K, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: THOMAS A COLLINS APC (Attorney)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition to motion; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Order Concerning Statement on Appeal APP-105 CR-136/144 BV032923. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Statement on Appeal Settled/Certified BV032923; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 08, 2019Notice in support of motion to dismiss action; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $387.45; Filed by:
Date: June 24, 2019Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification BV032923. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification BV032923; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 09, 2019Other - Judgment of Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed BV032923; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Appeal Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Appeal BV032923. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Judgment by Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Appeal Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Appeal BV032923. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Order Concerning Statement on Appeal APP-105 CR-136/144 BV032923. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Opposition to the Motion; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 12, 2017(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.
Date: May 12, 2017Notice (name extension) - in support of motion to dismiss action
Date: May 07, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 07, 2018Opposition (name extension) - to motion
Date: June 08, 2018Reply (name extension) - in Support of the Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 14, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)
Date: June 21, 2018Motion to Vacate (name extension) - Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2018Opposition (name extension) - to the Motion
Date: August 30, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal)
Date: September 13, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Opposition to the Motion; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: THOMAS A COLLINS APC (Attorney)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Notice in support of motion to dismiss action; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition to motion; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Other - Judgment of Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Judgment by Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/02/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by: 13333 FENTON AVENUE LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Amended Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification BV032923; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $387.45; Filed by:
Date: June 24, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.