Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Morrow Nona, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Bank Of America, represented by Le Anthony Q., Mcguirewoods Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark A. Borenstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: NONA MORROW (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Signed and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by:
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NONA MORROW (Plaintiff)
Date: July 25, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Complaint - Fraud
Date: March 10, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: March 11, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: March 22, 2016(name extension) - SUMMONS FILED
Date: March 22, 2016Response (name extension) - ANSWER
Date: April 03, 2017Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)
Date: September 11, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 21, 2017Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: September 11, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: December 19, 2017Motion for Order (name extension) - to Compel
Date: December 19, 2017Motion for Order (name extension) - for an order continuing
Date: January 23, 2018Stipulation and Order (name extension) - TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 01, 2018Minute Order - (Court Order)
Date: March 01, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/01/2018
Date: March 01, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel; Hearing on Motion - Othe...)
Date: March 14, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: NONA MORROW (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by:
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Signed and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/01/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NONA MORROW (Plaintiff)
Date: July 25, 2018Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.