Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shettlesworth, Jane Bell, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bragas, John Edwin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request of Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraining Order;10/13/2021 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing, DV--130, DV-700, DV-710 and DV-720 | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request of Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraining Order;10/13/2021 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Notice of Hearing to Renew Restraing Order Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Renew Restraining Order | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thomas E Baker to Pro Se |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.