Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Khan, Samina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Omarzai, Sherazkhan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 01, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions520 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time735 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Amended Judgment; MSE: 5/16/18 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing by Respondent: 07/13/18 to Correct Name on Judgment and Terminate Wage Attachment Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Respondent's Request for Order |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Reason for Document Return and Proposed Amended Judgment |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) Correction of Name on Documents and Terminate Wage Attachment |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Rooney Law Firm to Pro Se |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.