Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stetson, Krystle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Toscas, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kristen A. Lucena presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial94 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time16 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consolidated into Master Case Master File 16FL01709 |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Ron Marquez / Rooney Law Firm |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing Hearing date of 08/28/17 Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order of Court Trial |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner's Req DV/TRO filed 6/13/16 and Petitioner's Request RE Child Support filed 6/30/17; Issues: Father's Objection to Mediation Recommendation and Child Support; 1/2 day time est Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing [Petitoner] Filed 06-30-17 Re: Child Support Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment Amended Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO [Petitioner] Filed 6/13/16 *Respondent's Objection to the Mediation Recommendation*; Continued from 7/10/17 TRAC for Setting of Court Trial with Judge Lucena Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.