Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Freitas, John Dean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Freitas, Loretta Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with McLean, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference DISMISSAL Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 3rd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd FL Status Conference Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.