Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ngo, Nicholas Thien, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Law Offices Of Hung Nguyen, against Hoang Bui, Oanh Thi, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions158 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time158 days |
JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/06/2017
Date: June 06, 2017WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/06/2017
Date: June 06, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/28/2017 SUB SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2017REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 02/28/2017
Date: February 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/28/2017
Date: February 28, 2017DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 02/28/2017
Date: February 28, 2017NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/06/2017
Date: June 06, 2017SUMMONS 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/30/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 06/06/2017
Date: June 06, 2017DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/06/2017
Date: June 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.