Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bonas, Gale, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bonas, Guy, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions208 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time706 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/15/2017
Date: August 15, 2017DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/26/2017 prelim
Date: July 26, 2017NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/13/2017
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/26/2017
Date: July 26, 2017WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/12/2017
Date: September 12, 2017EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 12/06/2018
Date: December 06, 2018RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/13/2017 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/26/2017
Date: July 26, 2017NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 06/13/2017
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 07/26/2017
Date: July 26, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/03/2017
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 05/03/2017
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/25/2017 prelim
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/26/2017
Date: July 26, 2017PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/30/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/26/2017
Date: July 26, 2017SUMMONS 12/30/2016
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.