Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cabrera, Delores C, California Public Employees' Retirement System, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by York Tabucchi, against Cabrera, Domingo C, Jr., represented by Boyd Law Apc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with PALAFOX, JULIE A. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions342 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time398 days |
STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 08/01/2017
Date: August 01, 2017DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/28/2016 PRELIM AND FINAL
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00SUMMONS 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 01/10/2017
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 03/28/2017 CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/01/2017
Date: August 01, 2017PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/26/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00AT-ISSUE 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016 PRELIM
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER 11/28/2016 handwritten stip submitted the day of the hearing
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/01/2017
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/08/2016
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT 12/01/2016
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/03/2017
Date: August 03, 2017DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE - MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 11/08/2016
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/01/2017
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 11/28/2016
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/08/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08/26/2016 Amount:$60.00
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER 09/28/2017
Date: September 28, 2017NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT 03/28/2017
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/27/2016
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00AT-ISSUE 03/27/2017
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00ORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION SUPPORT 09/28/2017 stipulated
Date: September 28, 2017NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/08/2016
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/02/2017
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 03/28/2017 CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 08/08/2017
Date: August 08, 2017NOTICE - APPEARANCE & RESPONSE EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 05/02/2017
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/03/2017
Date: August 03, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.