Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gomez, Magadalena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gomez, Hector Arriaga, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time222 days |
JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 01/08/2021
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/17/2017
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/13/2016
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 01/08/2021
Date: January 08, 2021RETURN SHEET - MEMORANDUM 03/22/2017
Date: March 22, 2017NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 02/08/2017
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/05/2017
Date: April 05, 2017REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/17/2017
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/26/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/14/2021
Date: January 14, 2021MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 10/06/2020
Date: October 06, 2020INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/29/2020
Date: September 29, 2020INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/30/2020
Date: December 30, 2020SUMMONS 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.