Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Armando Sabinon, County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alejandro Contreras, against Anton Vo, Kho Trung Vo, represented by Devereaux Rendler, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Deborah A. Ryan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah A. Ryan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time404 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: September 21, 2017Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: February 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 3 |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Association/Co-Counsel | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Lien Claimant Lien in the amount of $955.00 |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 3 |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Referral: Mediation | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Demand: Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.