Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Daniel Mendez, Theresa Pasquinelli, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joshua R. Jachimowicz, against Alan Truong, Michael Troung, represented by Nathan Lewis Winegar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time517 days |
Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: January 10, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 20, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 06, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 19, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: December 06, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 10, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 05, 2017Request: Dismissal
Date: May 30, 2018Stipulation
Date: March 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Full Dismissal |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Mediator: Jerry Spolter on 5-11-18 per Stip. Hrg 4-19-18 is vacated. New hrg is set for 6-14-18, 10:30 am, signed by Judge Arand. |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer: Amended Complaint To 1st amended complaint; Atty Johns |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Amended FIRST; Atty Jachimowicz |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Granting Plts' leave to file 1st amended complaint |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order GRANTING plfs leave to file first amended cmplt - signed by Judge Arand |
|
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Referral: Mediation | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.