Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Claudia Jimenez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kevin Shawn Conlogue, against Fung Gertrude Leung, represented by Heidi Coleen Quan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time743 days |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2017Request: Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 26, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 06, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 04, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2017Notice: Settlement
Date: October 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 16, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 05, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: June 07, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 25, 2018OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: September 21, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 19 |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Notice of Change of Address?? |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.