Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sameer Rao, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Michael William Stebbins, against Roy Antonyraj, Subramanian Varadarajan, Zycada Networks, Inc., represented by Koray J. Bulut, Noah Jennings, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time537 days |
Minute Order
Date: March 29, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 19, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: March 29, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: September 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2017Stipulation and Order: ADR
Date: January 11, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: June 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: ADR Appointed Hon. Kevin Murphy (Ret.) as Mediator; Session held on 3-15-18 |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Referral: Mediation | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) Answer to third amended complaint. Atty Jennings |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Amended third amended complaint *no summons issued* |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte re: ex parte proposed order after hearing - The Court already prepared, signed and mailed order on 9-19-17 - signed by Judge Folan *see order for details* |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application and Order: Ex Parte *order after hrg - to sustain in part demurrer to SAC (Michael W. Stebbins) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.