Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Claude Stockham, filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited (08) case against Morgan Hill Appartments, represented by Craig Jay Bassett, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited (08) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Minute Order
Date: March 21, 2017Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: September 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs total: $465.00 |
|
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 6 |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - Notice Required to cont. CMC (Claude Stockam, In Pro Per) |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte to continue CMC Denied, Signed by Judge Zayner |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order IT IS ORDERED that the Demurrer is ordered OFF CAL as MOOT. An FAC was timely filed on Feb 10, 2017 under CCP 472. Plt Claude Stockam is ordered to serve a copy of the FAC w/in 5 days of ntc of this order. Zayner |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference atty Bassett |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.