Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cristian Andrade Garcia, Maria Ramos Sandoval, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jose Galindo, Maria Basilio, Mi Panaderia La Espiga, represented by Roger David Hecht, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with James L. Stoelker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time504 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 12, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2017Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice
Date: May 07, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice Request for Full Dismissal w/Prej |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail POS Re Dismissal on Roger Hecht |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 13 |
|
September 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 3 |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Referral: Mediation | |
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail cmc |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.