Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lalani Nailau, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Albert K. Clarke, Robert M. Pickle, Susan M. Clarke, The Pickle Marital Trust, represented by Bradley Mark Kass, Daniel George Balich, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1353 days |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Lalani Nailau against defendants Susan M. Clarke, Albert K. Clarke, and Does 1 to 20. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, stating that their actions caused injuries and dam...
Motion: Consolidate
Date: September 25, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: March 05, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: January 30, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 02, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 20, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: December 17, 2018Motion: Continue
Date: February 08, 2018Hearing: Discovery
Date: November 14, 2017Order: Proposed
Date: January 30, 2019Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2018Order
Date: January 29, 2018Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: December 21, 2017Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 29, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 29, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: December 01, 2017Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: January 29, 2020Request: Action
Date: April 26, 2019Statement
Date: January 29, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 03, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 2019Response/Reply
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 05, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: March 27, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 19, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 26, 2018Response/Reply
Date: September 18, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 05, 2018Response/Reply
Date: September 18, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 16, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 13, 2017Order: Proposed
Date: July 16, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: September 15, 2017Request: Judicial Notice
Date: September 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: July 31, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 08, 2017Declaration: In Support
Date: September 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 08, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 24, 2018Response/Reply
Date: February 06, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 06, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 29, 2018Separate Statement
Date: December 01, 2017Motion: Continuance (Trial)
Date: January 29, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2017Motion: Other
Date: September 15, 2017Declaration: In Support
Date: September 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 21, 2016Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2017Response/Reply
Date: December 29, 2016Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2016Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 27, 2016Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 13, 2016Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 12, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 09, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: May 08, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 05, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: February 18, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 29, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: November 21, 2019Order
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2019Motion: Consolidate
Date: July 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: September 05, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: December 17, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 25, 2018Request
Date: February 21, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 17, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: February 18, 2020Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: February 05, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: December 17, 2018Stipulation
Date: February 18, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 05, 2018Separate Statement
Date: January 30, 2019Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: January 29, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 19, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 25, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 31, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: May 28, 2020Brief: Trial
Date: February 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request HRG 2/18/20 for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore- Signed by Judge Pierce |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO ADMIT EVIDENCE OF BLOOD ALCOHOL RESULTS |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGED ALCOHOL AND/OR MARIJUANA USE |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S INJURIES/SURGERY |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Defendant's Stipulations on Factual and Legal Issues |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial Defendant Susan M. Clarkes Trial Brief |
|
February 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 2 |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.