Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ruben Mendoza, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by David Vincent Roth, Nicholas Peter Burke, Michael Alan Horowitz, against City Sports Club, Dp Ventures Llc, Fitness International, Llc, Peopleready, Inc., Son Tran, (total of 6) See All represented by Elizabeth Dunn Rhodes, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Brian C. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by PeopleReady, Inc. against various cross-defendants in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Santa Clara. The cross-complaint alleges multiple causes of action, including total equitable ...
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 03, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: June 20, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: September 20, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: November 13, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: August 24, 2017Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 17, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 11, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 06, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 15, 2020Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: August 30, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: July 01, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 19, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 19, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: June 19, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 19, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: June 18, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 06, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 04, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 29, 2016Order: Proposed
Date: June 06, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: March 19, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: June 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: March 19, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 19, 2019Separate Statement
Date: March 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 19, 2019Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: March 13, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 15, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: October 16, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 29, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: November 01, 2018Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: October 09, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: September 27, 2018Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: August 31, 2018Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee)
Date: August 14, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: September 12, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 26, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 10, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: August 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 10, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 24, 2018Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: June 04, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: August 10, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: July 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: April 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: May 24, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 19, 2018Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 24, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2017Conference: Case Management
Date: July 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 23, 2018Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: June 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 09, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: July 17, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: December 17, 2019Order
Date: July 31, 2020Order: Submitted Matter
Date: September 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 31, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 06, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 16, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 15, 2018Separate Statement
Date: August 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 24, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: August 15, 2018Motion: Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: August 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: October 29, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 04, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: April 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 17, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2018Hearing: Order to Show Cause
Date: January 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: March 07, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 29, 2018Response/Reply
Date: November 08, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 09, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 16, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: October 29, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 14, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 26, 2018Separate Statement
Date: December 17, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: September 20, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: December 17, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 03, 2020Motion: Judgment on Pleadings
Date: October 29, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 13, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: August 03, 2020Response/Reply
Date: November 08, 2018Order
Date: June 12, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 15, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
These cross-actions arise from an accident on a construction worksite in which Plaintiff Ruben Mendoza was injured. On February 10, 2021, the Court granted summary judgment in favor of Cross-Defendant...
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
March 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 1 |
|
January 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
These cross-actions arise from an accident on a construction worksite in which Plaintiff Ruben Mendoza was injured. Cross-defendant Jesmar Mechanical, Inc. moves for summary judgment or adjudication o...
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
December 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
These cross-actions arise from an accident on a construction worksite in which Plaintiff Ruben Mendoza was injured. Cross-Defendant Ageless Plastering Company moves for summary judgment on the ground ...
Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
December 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Reserved: Summary Judgment
Judge: Department 1 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
These cross-actions arise from an accident on a construction worksite in which plaintiff Ruben Mendoza was injured. Cross-defendant Jesmar Mechanical, Inc. moves for judgment on the pleadings on the c...
Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Judgment on Pleadings
Judge: Department 1 |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 1 |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Rescheduled Hearings |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice CMC reset from 9/18/20 to 9/24/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.