Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Robert R. Powell, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against John Adams Iv, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1549 days |
Minute Order
Date: October 25, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 02, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 04, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 30, 2016Review: Case Status
Date: January 10, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: October 10, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 25, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 10, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: May 03, 2018Review: Case Status
Date: June 06, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 27, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: April 23, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: July 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment: Default | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (Eserved 6/8/2020) Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Item 5(a-c) is incomplete. Also, the total amount listed on the proposed judgment is not the correct sum of the amounts (please make sure it matches what is listed on the default). |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Clerk's judgment is inappropriate because contract claim is for goods and services. Please apply for court judgment. |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.