Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Campbell, Magnolia Lane Condominium Association, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Callendar Associates, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2016 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Inv Cond Unlimited (14) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time651 days |
Minute Order
Date: July 19, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: February 09, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: July 18, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: June 01, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: June 01, 2017Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2016Minute Order
Date: February 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 9 |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Atty David Stock. |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement This ntc of conditional settlement between Plt and 3 Defs. (Atty Andrew Baugh) Judge: William J. Elfving |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference atty: Koenig |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 9 |
|
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.