Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brian Blackmon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Louis S. Abronson, against Julie Harmonner, Robert Flores, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1208 days |
Minute Order
Date: March 29, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2016Application: Order of Examination
Date: March 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2016Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: November 10, 2016Judgment: Satisfaction
Date: August 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Santa Clara, satisfied |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction in FULL |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Santa Clara Cty. $126,765.04 |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Application and Order for Appearance and Examination |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment: Issued | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter default judgment - see dispo screen |
|
March 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing: Request for Default Judgment
Judge: Department 8 |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Plt Brian Blackmon in support of default judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.