Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
M.G. Santos, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with William J. Elfving presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2016Minute Order
Date: August 18, 2016Minute Order
Date: March 07, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 3 |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Gary Swenson's Motion to Consolidate set for 3-30-17 9:00 D3 in Case #115CV283128 (James A. McDaniel) Judge: William J. Elfving |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of David B. Draper in Support of Opposition to Gary Swenson's Motion to Consolidate set for 3-30-17 in 115CV283128 |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Federal Express |
|
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 3 |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Atty Picone |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
January 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.