Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Prabakaran Kanagarasu, Vigneshwaran Murugan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against D.B. Food Service Llc, Narendra Singh Kloty, Naresh Gupta, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1257 days |
Review: Case Status
Date: December 07, 2017Declaration: In Support
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 18, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: April 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2017Hearing: Request for Default Judgment
Date: June 24, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 05, 2019Hearing: Order to Show Cause
Date: February 02, 2017Judgment
Date: August 05, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: August 09, 2018Judgment
Date: August 05, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: January 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 25, 2019Hearing: Request for Default Judgment
Date: August 05, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: July 23, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: May 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment $390,218.73, granted by Judge Zayner |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment $107,523.16, granted by Judge Zayner |
|
August 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Request for Default Judgment
Judge: Department 6 |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
July 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Does only |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Judgment already entered on 8/5/2019. |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.