Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aziz Abad, Farah Dormanesh, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Deutsche Bank 2006-Ar27, Indymac Bank, Fbs, Indymac Bank, Fsb, Indymac Bank, Fsb, Indymac Bank, Fbs, Western Progressive, Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Vincent J. Chiarello presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time346 days |
Minute Order
Date: June 09, 2016Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 03, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) | |
October 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 22 |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order sustaining deft demurrer to pltf's FAC w/o leave to amend (Judge McGowen) |
|
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing: Demurrer
Judge: Department 7 |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Ruling | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 10-4-16, 9am, d.7; atty isola Judge: Beth A. R. McGowen |
|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour | |
August 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.