Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alamar Ii, Llc, Pini, Dario, Etzel, Suzanne, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hale, Timothy C, against 104 Las Aquajes, Llc, Alamar Iii, Llc, Alamar Ii Llc, Ala Mar Motel, Dlp Management Co. Inc., (total of 12) See All represented by Carter, Kathleen Mary Kushi, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions263 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time263 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
November 19, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion Deem Admissions Off calendar due to settlement of the matter.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
October 15, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion Compel This motion is off calendar, the court has been advised that the matter is settled.
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.