Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Merrill, Glenn S, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Trueman, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Debtors Examination - Small Claims
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.