Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobsen, Devin, against Moorhouse, Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time664 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10,000, Received | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.