Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miller, Bethany, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Glassey, Sharon E, against Falk & Blacksberg Inc, Ford Motor Company, represented by Matrosova, Olga, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time327 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order, Filed | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.