Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dipiero, Anthony, against Hernandez, Herminia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.