Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sherrill, Donald, against Handleman, Andrew S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2016 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.