Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Taira, Gordon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gamble, William K, against Dignity Health, Dignity Health Dba Marian Extended Care Center, Dignity Health Dba Marian Regional Medical Center, represented by Trotter, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management131 days |
Filing DateJune 29, 2016 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint, Filed | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.