Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mendez, Antonio Valdovinos, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Roberts, Geary E, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Civil harassment restraining order after hearing Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Granted Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of unsuccessful service |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment Temps Granted Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Temps Granted Judge: Gunn, David E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.