Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mcgurk, Brian Patrick, against Romero, Francisca, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Order
Date: June 08, 2017Order
Date: October 06, 2017Complaint
Date: November 30, 2016Order
Date: June 08, 2017Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: April 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Aside Judgment , And Dismissal Without Prejudice Order Setting Aside Judgment, And Dismissal Without Prejudice Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee Motion hearings - Postdispo Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Dismiss Without Prejudcie Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The motion to vacate judgment and enter a dismissal is granted. The court will execute the proposed order. |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee Plainitff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment;Dismiss without Prejudice |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order re Copies Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment By Clerk ** Set Aside By Court Order 10/06/17 ** |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings Notice of Stay Of Proceedings |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part Does 1 to 20; Ct 2 Quantum Meruit Without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.