Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sterling, Kenneth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Alano Club, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, No Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time31 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Debtors Examination - Small Claims
Judge: Pro Tem, Assigned |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees, Filed | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Pro Tem, Assigned |
|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.