Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Merideth, Robin, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Dealba, George, Salvador, Araseli, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Debtr's Statement Re: Satis of Jdgmnt: Entry, Filed | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Return Receipt, Filed | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Return Receipt, Filed | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.