Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez, Carlos, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bunch, Bruce, against Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital, Yoon, M.D., John, Sharma, M.D., Rohit, Rink, M.D., Donald T, Bounoua, M.D., Farida, (total of 5) See All represented by Spackman, Hugh S, Connely, Mark B, Haskins, Angela S, Clark, Bradley C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJune 23, 2016 |
CategoryUnlimited Medical Malpractice (45) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions222 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time222 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Lodged Documents, Returned | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 09, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Summary Judgment Tentative Ruling: The court grants in part and denies in part, Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital and Rohit Sharma, M.D.’s motion for summary judgment. The ...
Judge: Judge Donna Geck |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.