Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chiminello, Eugene, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Thompson, James Julian, against Budget Rent A Car Co, Cifuentes, Manuel, Cifuentes, Sonia, J & J Delivery, Malco Enterprises Of Nevada, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Kubein, Ramsey, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial461 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions846 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time869 days |
Order After Hearing
Date: February 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2017Complaint
Date: September 06, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: September 26, 2016Amendment to Complaint
Date: April 17, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 05, 2017Order
Date: October 10, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 09, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: August 30, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: August 07, 2017Request
Date: July 12, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: February 23, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2018Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: December 13, 2016Statement
Date: November 09, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: July 20, 2018Order
Date: November 02, 2017Order
Date: August 01, 2018Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: September 21, 2018Notice of Reassignment
Date: December 21, 2017Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered
Date: January 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 22, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 03, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: April 19, 2018Reply
Date: September 28, 2017Order
Date: September 13, 2017Request
Date: September 22, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: November 13, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 05, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2018Request
Date: November 13, 2018Order
Date: December 31, 2018Reply
Date: July 24, 2017Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: November 16, 2018Notice
Date: February 21, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 08, 2017Statement
Date: July 07, 2017Declaration
Date: February 01, 2018Declaration
Date: October 09, 2018Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Continued from 11/16/2018 for Status of Dismissal Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Status Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit / Proof of Publication Proof or Affidavit of Publication |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Change of Date for OSC Hearing Set for 11/16/18; Proposed Order Changing OSC Hearing Date Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.