Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Silva, Maria Guadalupe Gonzalez, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rosas, Vicente Aguilar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 28, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims: 1,501 - 5,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.