Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Solmon, Gregory, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Kodydek, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing expires: 6/19/17 Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of tro as to respondent |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment Temps Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.