Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Worden, Kevin D., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Over $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Received for Signature
Date: May 31, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: January 05, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: November 29, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: January 05, 2021Judgment Received
Date: January 05, 2021General Denial Filed
Date: January 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Set Aside Dismissal
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Motion to Vacate Dismissal Under CCP 664.6 & Enter Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Judgment |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Lodging |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Worden, Kevin__Signed Subs of Atty__12.18.20 Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney: Curtis Molloy New Attorney: Pro Se |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Clerks office for futher processing |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Kevin D. Worden |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.