Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jensen, Judy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hager, Paul R., against Bargain Party Rent-All & Sales, Inc., Johnson, Jay, Johnson, Laurie, Snaplock Industries, Inc., represented by Decker, Jason A., Mcquillan, Steven M., Yates, M. Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2016 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial567 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time539 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 05, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 21, 2018Statement filed
Date: February 16, 2018Ex parte Filed
Date: February 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 16, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: February 14, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 08, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 06, 2018Order - Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 01, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: January 23, 2018Answer Filed
Date: August 04, 2017Amendment filed
Date: May 15, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 05, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2016ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: October 28, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal of Entire Action |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days. Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement filed Proposed Joint Neutral Statement of the Case |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Proposed Document filed Defendant's Proposed Jury Instruction |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice List filed Def Exhibit List |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice List filed Def. Witness List |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion in Limine filed DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion in Limine filed DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion in Limine filed DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.